US SB3874 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-2)
Status: Introduced on June 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Child Care Is Essential Act This bill establishes and provides $50 billion in appropriations for the Child Care Stabilization Fund to award grants to child care providers during and after the COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019) public health emergency. The bill establishes the fund within the existing Department of Health and Human Services Child Care and Development Block Grant (CCDBG) program, and the grants must be administered by the existing CCDBG lead agencies of states, tribes, or territories. Child care providers that are currently open or temporarily closed due to COVID-19 are eligible to receive grant awards, which are based on the provider's operating costs before the COVID-19 public health emergency and adjusted to account for the increased costs of providing child care as a result of COVID-19.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child Care Is Essential Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-03SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.

Same As/Similar To

HB7027 (Related) 2020-07-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
HR1053 (Similar To) 2020-07-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB4112 (Related) 2020-06-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback