VA SB184 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0716)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0716)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
MEI Project Approval Commission; work of the Commission. Expands the scope of incentive packages to be reviewed by the MEI Project Approval Commission by eliminating the limitation that the Commission may only review incentive packages for MEI projects that are proposed to be funded by bonds of the Virginia Public Building Authority and by providing for the Commission to review incentive packages (including but not limited to incentive packages for MEI projects) for which (i) one or more of the incentives in the incentive package is not authorized under current law, or (ii) an amendment by the General Assembly is being sought to one or more currently existing incentives included as part of the incentive package. A Major Employment and Investment project is defined under current law as a regional economic development project in which a private entity is expected to make a capital investment exceeding $250 million in the Commonwealth and to create more than 400 new full-time jobs. As part of its review, the Commission may endorse certain incentive packages for approval by the General Assembly.
Title
MEI Project Approval Commission; shall review financing for individual incentive packages, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-09 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with substitute (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with substitute (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0716) | |
2010-04-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 716 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-15 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-14 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-13 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB184ER) | |
2010-03-13 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2010-03-09 | Senate: Title replaced 10105625D-H1 | |
2010-03-09 | Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-05 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-05 | House: Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-05 | House: Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House | |
2010-03-05 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-05 | House: Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-05 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB184H1 | |
2010-03-05 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 10105625D-H1 | |
2010-03-05 | House: Read third time | |
2010-03-04 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2010-03-03 | House: Read second time | |
2010-03-01 | House: Committee substitute printed 10105625D-H1 | |
2010-03-01 | House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-26 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-23 | House: Assigned App. sub: Economic Development, Agriculture and Natural Resources | |
2010-02-17 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2010-02-17 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-17 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB184S1 | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 10104377D-S1 | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-12 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 10104377D-S1 | |
2010-02-12 | Senate: Reported from Rules with substitute (17-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-18 | Senate: Assigned Rules sub: Studies | |
2010-01-11 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2010-01-11 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102843D |
Same As/Similar To
HB199 (Same As) 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0543)