VA SB51 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0244)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0244)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Absentee voting; poll watchers. Authorizes any person to vote absentee who has been designated by a political party or candidate to be a representative of that party or candidate inside a polling place on the day of the election.
Title
Absentee ballot; person designated by political party to represent inside polling place may cast.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0244) | |
2010-04-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 244 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-12 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-10 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-10 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB51ER) | |
2010-03-10 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2010-03-02 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-02 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-02 | House: Read third time | |
2010-03-01 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-26 | House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (20-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-23 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | House: Assigned P & E sub: #2 Elections | |
2010-02-08 | House: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2010-02-08 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-08 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-01 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-29 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2010-01-28 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-26 | Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (11-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-04 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2010-01-04 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10100888D |