WA HB1109 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the use of the local infrastructure financing tool for downtown development and redevelopment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the use of the local infrastructure financing tool for downtown development and redevelopment.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-15 By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2010-01-11 By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2009-02-12 Public hearing in the House Committee on Community & Economic Development & Trade at 10:00 AM.
2009-01-13 First reading, referred to Community & Economic Development & Trade.

Same As/Similar To

SB6056 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback