WA HB1120 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-25 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-25 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning uniform laws.
Title
Concerning uniform laws.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-07 - Senate - Senate vote on Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-25 | Effective date 7/26/2009. | |
2009-04-25 | Chapter 218, 2009 Laws. | |
2009-04-25 | Governor signed. | |
2009-04-20 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-19 | President signed. | |
2009-04-18 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-04-16 | Passed final passage; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2009-04-16 | House concurred in Senate amendments. | |
2009-04-07 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 43; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 6. | |
2009-04-07 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-07 | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. | |
2009-04-02 | Placed on second reading consent calendar. | |
2009-03-20 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-20 | JUD - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2009-03-18 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Judiciary at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-02-25 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. | |
2009-02-23 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2009-02-23 | Placed on third reading. | |
2009-02-23 | Committee recommendations adopted. | |
2009-02-19 | Placed on second reading suspension calendar by Rules Committee. | |
2009-01-26 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-01-22 | JUDI - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-01-22 | JUDI - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-01-22 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-01-21 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-01-14 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. |