WA HB1176 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying the administration and disciplining authority of the Washington state veterinary board of governors.
Title
Modifying the administration and disciplining authority of the Washington state veterinary board of governors.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-02-06 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-05 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-01-14 | First reading, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5532 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1176&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1176.pdf |