WA HB1257 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting unjustified employer searches of employee personal vehicles.
Title
Prohibiting unjustified employer searches of employee personal vehicles.
Sponsors
Rep. Ed Orcutt [R] | Sen. John Lovick [D] | Rep. Jim Walsh [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-15 - House - House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-02-15 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2021-02-15 | House | LAWS - Majority; do pass. |
2021-02-15 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 3:30 PM. |
2021-02-02 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 10:00 AM. |
2021-01-18 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. |