WA HB1575 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Strengthening the rights of workers through collective bargaining by addressing authorizations and revocations, certifications, and the authority to deduct and accept union dues and fees.
Title
Strengthening the rights of workers through collective bargaining by addressing authorizations and revocations, certifications, and the authority to deduct and accept union dues and fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-18 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 56 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 25 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 25 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-04-30 | House | Chapter 230, 2019 Laws. |
2019-04-30 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-26 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-23 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-18 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 56; nays, 38; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2019-04-18 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 25; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Held on second reading. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | LBRC - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:30 AM. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:30 AM. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
2019-03-11 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 57; nays, 41; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-03-11 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-11 | House | Committee recommendations adopted and the 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-04 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-03-01 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-26 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-26 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-26 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-26 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-02-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-18 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-18 | House | LAWS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-18 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-07 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-05 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-04 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-24 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5623 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.