WA HB1897 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning vehicle combinations that may be operated on public highways.
Title
Concerning vehicle combinations that may be operated on public highways.
Sponsors
Rep. Beth Doglio [D] | Rep. Morgan Irwin [R] | Sen. John Lovick [D] | Rep. Luanne Van Werven [R] |
Rep. Jim Walsh [R] | Rep. Joe Fitzgibbon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-04 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5830 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1897&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1897.pdf |