WA HB1912 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-22 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-22 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring state agencies to share information to encourage economic development.
Title
Requiring state agencies to share information to encourage economic development.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-19 - House - House Committee on Innovation, Community & Economic Development, & Veterans: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-22 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2024-01-19 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-01-19 | House | ICEV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-01-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Community & Economic Development, & Veterans at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Innovation, Community & Economic Development, & Veterans at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Innovation, Community & Economic Development, & Veterans. |
2023-12-07 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5817 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-16 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services, Gaming & Trade at 8:00 AM.