WA HB2020 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting the disclosure of names in employment investigation records.
Title
Exempting the disclosure of names in employment investigation records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-27 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | House | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-05-09 | House | Chapter 349, 2019 Laws. |
2019-05-09 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-28 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-28 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-27 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-04-27 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2019-04-27 | Senate | Senate insists on its position and asks House to concur. |
2019-04-19 | House | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments. Asks Senate to recede from amendments. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2019-04-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | SGTE - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
2019-03-05 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-03-05 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-05 | House | Floor amendment |
2019-03-01 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-22 | House | SGOV - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-12 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5929 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.