WA HB2062 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Effective date 10/1/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Effective date 10/1/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creating Seattle Storm special license plates to fund youth leadership and sports programs.
Title
Creating Seattle Storm special license plates to fund youth leadership and sports programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 91 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 91 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | House | Effective date 10/1/2019. |
2019-05-13 | House | Chapter 384, 2019 Laws. |
2019-05-13 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-26 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-13 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 43; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 5. |
2019-04-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2019-03-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 91; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2019-03-13 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-07 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-03-01 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-28 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-28 | House | TR - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 9:30 AM. |
2019-02-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-15 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5930 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - Senate Rules "X" file.