WA HB2242 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning travel trailers.
Title
Concerning travel trailers.
Sponsors
Rep. Sharon Wylie [D] | Rep. Ed Orcutt [R] | Rep. Mike Chapman [D] | Rep. Steve Bergquist [D] |
Rep. Jeremie Dufault [R] | Rep. Brian Blake [D] | Sen. Sharon Shewmake [D] | Sen. Chris Gildon [R] |
Rep. Morgan Irwin [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-25 | House | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-25 | House | Chapter 110, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-25 | House | Governor signed. |
2020-03-12 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-12 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2020-02-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-02-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-04 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-01-29 | House | TR - Majority; do pass. |
2020-01-29 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2019-12-18 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6083 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.