WA HB2411 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Effective date 6/11/2020*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Preventing suicide.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Preventing suicide.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-31HouseEffective date 6/11/2020*.
2020-03-31HouseChapter 229, 2020 Laws.
2020-03-31HouseGovernor signed.
2020-03-09HouseDelivered to Governor.
2020-03-06SenatePresident signed.
2020-03-05HouseSpeaker signed.
2020-03-03SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-03-03SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-03-02SenatePlaced on second reading consent calendar.
2020-02-25SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-02-24SenateHLTC - Majority; do pass.
2020-02-24SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM.
2020-02-21SenatePublic hearing and executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM.
2020-02-14SenateFirst reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.
2020-02-12HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3.
2020-02-12HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-02-12HouseFloor amendment
2020-02-12House1st substitute bill substituted
2020-02-10HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2020-02-04HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2020-01-31HouseHCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2020-01-31HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM.
2020-01-22HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
2020-01-14HouseFirst reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=2411&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2411.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2411-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2411-S.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/2411-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/2411-S.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=121061&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=02-12-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2411&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=121061&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-03-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2411&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback