WA HB2426 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-5)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding provisions relating to vulnerable adults.
Title
Expanding provisions relating to vulnerable adults.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-20 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety & Emergency Preparedness at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-11 | First reading, referred to Public Safety & Emergency Preparedness. | |
2010-12-07 | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6202 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-19 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2426&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2426.pdf |