WA HB2680 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing tribal representation on the emergency management council.
Title
Establishing tribal representation on the emergency management council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-18 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-29 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | SGTE - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
2020-02-18 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-02-18 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-16 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-07 | House | SGOV - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-07 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-04 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-17 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6346 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.