WA SB5203 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating an apprenticeship program for inmates.
Title
Creating an apprenticeship program for inmates.
Sponsors
Sen. Keith Wagoner [R] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. Mark Mullet [D] | Sen. Reuven Carlyle [D] |
Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] | Sen. Mona Das [D] | Sen. Emily Randall [D] | Sen. Lisa Wellman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | HSRR - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5203&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5203.pdf |