WA SB5433 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-19 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-19 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying provisions of local option taxes.
Title
Modifying provisions of local option taxes.
Sponsors
Sen. Darlene Fairley [D] | Sen. Karen Fraser [D] | Sen. Harry Morton [R] | Sen. Kevin Ranker [D] |
Sen. Debbie Regala [D] | Sen. Phillips Rockefeller [D] | Sen. Paull Shin [D] | Sen. Daniel Swecker [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-19 | Effective date 7/26/2009. | |
2009-05-19 | Chapter 551, 2009 Laws PV. | |
2009-05-19 | Governor partially vetoed. | |
2009-04-26 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-26 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-04-26 | President signed. | |
2009-04-26 | Passed final passage as recommended by conference committee; yeas, 25; nays, 24; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2009-04-26 | Conference committee report adopted. | |
2009-04-26 | Passed final passage as recommended by conference committee; yeas, 51; nays, 44; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2009-04-26 | Conference committee report adopted. | |
2009-04-25 | Due to correction to Conference committee report | |
2009-04-25 | Conference committee report; received 3:15 PM 4/25/2009. | |
2009-04-25 | Due to correction to Conference committee report. | |
2009-04-25 | Conference committee report; received 3:15 PM 4/25/2009. | |
2009-04-25 | Signed by Senators Tom, Regala; Representatives Hunter, Nelson. | |
2009-04-25 | Conference committee report; received 10:58 AM 4/25/2009. | |
2009-04-25 | Signed by Representatives Hunter, Nelson; Senators Tom, Regala. | |
2009-04-25 | Conference committee report; received 10:15 AM 4/25/2009. | |
2009-04-24 | Conference committee appointed. Senators Tom, Regala, King. | |
2009-04-23 | Conference committee appointed. Representatives Hunter, Nelson, Orcutt. | |
2009-04-23 | Conference committee request granted. | |
2009-04-20 | Senate refuses to concur in House amendments. Asks House for conference thereon. | |
2009-04-17 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 52; nays, 46; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2009-04-17 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-17 | Floor amendment | |
2009-04-17 | Committee amendment not adopted. | |
2009-04-08 | Placed on second reading. | |
2009-03-30 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-27 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2009-03-27 | FIN - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2009-03-27 | FIN - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-03-27 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-03-24 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-03-13 | First reading, referred to Finance. | |
2009-03-11 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 31; nays, 16; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2009-03-11 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-11 | 2nd substitute bill substituted | |
2009-03-09 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-03-02 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-02 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2009-03-02 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2009-03-02 | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-03-02 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-26 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-23 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2009-02-23 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2009-02-23 | And refer to Ways & Means. | |
2009-02-23 | GO - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-19 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-02-16 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 7:45 AM. | |
2009-02-12 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-01-22 | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections. |