WA SB5437 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Effective date 7/28/2019**.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Expanding eligibility to the early childhood education and assistance program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expanding eligibility to the early childhood education and assistance program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 89 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21SenateEffective date 7/28/2019**.
2019-05-21SenateChapter 408, 2019 Laws.
2019-05-21SenateGovernor signed.
2019-04-25SenateDelivered to Governor.
2019-04-24HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-23SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-22SenatePassed final passage; yeas, 45; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-04-22SenateSenate concurred in House amendments.
2019-04-11HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 89; nays, 8; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-04-11HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-11HouseCommittee recommendations adopted and the bill amended.
2019-04-10HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-04-09HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-04-06HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-04-06HouseAPP - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-04-06HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2019-04-05HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-27HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-03-22HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2019-03-22HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-03-22HouseHSEL - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-03-22HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 8:00 AM.
2019-03-20HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-15HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 9:00 AM.
2019-03-08HouseFirst reading, referred to Human Services & Early Learning.
2019-03-06SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-03-06SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-06Senate2nd substitute bill substituted
2019-03-05SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-03-01SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-03-01SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-03-01SenateWM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-03-01SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 12:20 PM.
2019-02-28SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-14SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2019-02-12SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-02-12SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2019-02-12SenateEDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-12SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 12:05 PM.
2019-02-04SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-21SenateFirst reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.

Same As/Similar To

HB1351 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-01 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5437&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5437.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5437-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5437-S2.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/5437-S2.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/Senate/5437-S2.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118099&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-06-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5437&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118099&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-11-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5437&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118099&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-22-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5437&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback