WA SB5517 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting institutions of higher education that do not use archives and records management services from payment for those services.
Title
Exempting institutions of higher education that do not use archives and records management services from payment for those services.
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Hill [R] | Sen. Derek Kilmer [D] | Sen. Paull Shin [D] | Sen. Rodney Tom [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-02-01 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. | |
2012-01-09 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-12-07 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. On motion, referred to Higher Education & Workforce Development. | |
2011-11-28 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-26 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2011-03-04 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-03-02 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2011-02-25 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-02-25 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2011-02-25 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2011-02-25 | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2011-02-25 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 12:30 PM. | |
2011-02-25 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 8:00 AM. | |
2011-02-18 | On motion, referred to Ways & Means. | |
2011-02-18 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-02-17 | HEWD - Majority; do pass. | |
2011-02-16 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-02-09 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-01-28 | First reading, referred to Higher Education & Workforce Development. |