WA SB5527 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Adding sublimits of coverage to an insurance policy's declaration page.
Title
Adding sublimits of coverage to an insurance policy's declaration page.
Sponsors
Sen. Lisa Wellman [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. David Frockt [D] | Sen. T'wina Nobles [D] |
Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | BFST - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade at 8:30 AM. |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Business, Financial Services & Trade. |
2021-12-10 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |