WA SB5541 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning regional mobility grants and tax incentives for improving transportation connectivity and efficiency.
Title
Concerning regional mobility grants and tax incentives for improving transportation connectivity and efficiency.
Sponsors
Sen. Jerome Delvin [R] | Sen. Mary Haugen [D] | Sen. Curtis King [R] | Sen. Daniel Kline [D] |
Sen. Jeanne Kohl-Welles [D] | Sen. Edward Murray [D] | Sen. Pamela Roach [R] | Sen. Paull Shin [D] |
Sen. Scott White [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-01-09 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-11-28 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-26 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2011-03-02 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2011-02-25 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-02-25 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2011-02-25 | TRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2011-02-24 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-02-14 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2011-01-28 | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1882 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.