WA SB5670 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the allowable powers of fire protection districts.
Title
Expanding the allowable powers of fire protection districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Chapter 402, 2019 Laws. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2019-04-10 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2019-04-10 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-10 | House | Committee recommendations adopted and the bill amended. |
2019-04-03 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-03-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-03-20 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-03-20 | House | LG - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-03-20 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2019-03-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-09 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | LGOV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1669 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.