WA SB5720 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-30 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-30 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Including stepchildren in tuition waivers for children of veterans and national guard members.
Title
Including stepchildren in tuition waivers for children of veterans and national guard members.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-30 | Effective date 7/26/2009. | |
2009-04-30 | Chapter 316, 2009 Laws. | |
2009-04-30 | Governor signed. | |
2009-04-22 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-21 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-04-21 | President signed. | |
2009-04-20 | Passed final passage; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2009-04-20 | Senate concurred in House amendments. | |
2009-04-01 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2009-04-01 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-01 | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. | |
2009-03-27 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-03-24 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-20 | HE - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2009-03-20 | HE - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-03-20 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Higher Education at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-03-13 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Higher Education at 9:00 AM. | |
2009-03-04 | First reading, referred to Higher Education. | |
2009-03-03 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2009-03-03 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-02-10 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-02-06 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-06 | HEWD - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-02-04 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-01-29 | First reading, referred to Higher Education & Workforce Development. |