WA SB5720 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing the payment of production-based compensation wages for the employment and use of labor in agricultural activities and in the production, handling, and storage of farm products.
Title
Addressing the payment of production-based compensation wages for the employment and use of labor in agricultural activities and in the production, handling, and storage of farm products.
Sponsors
Sen. Brad Hawkins [R] | Sen. Steven Hobbs [D] | Sen. Dean Takko [D] | Sen. Michael Baumgartner [R] |
Sen. Tim Sheldon [D] | Sen. Curtis King [R] | Sen. Sharon Brown [R] | Sen. Mark Schoesler [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | House | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-07-20 | House | Returned to Senate Rules 3. |
2017-06-28 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 26; nays, 21; absent, 1; excused, 1. |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Returned to Senate Rules 3. |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Rules White Sheet. |
2017-04-23 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-03-07 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 28; nays, 18; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | AWTE - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Trade & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Trade & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Trade & Economic Development. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2049 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.