WA SB6096 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Preventing disruption of certain state-financed and procured services due to labor unrest within contracted service providers.
Title
Preventing disruption of certain state-financed and procured services due to labor unrest within contracted service providers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-27 | Senate | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-27 | Senate | Chapter 201, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-27 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-05 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-04 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 62; nays, 35; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-04 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-04 | House | Amendment ruled beyond the scope and object of the bill. |
2020-03-02 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-25 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-25 | House | LAWS - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-25 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-25 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 35; nays, 12; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | LBRC - Majority; do pass. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:30 AM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |