WA SB6215 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Improving tax and revenue laws.
Title
Improving tax and revenue laws.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-01 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - House Committee on Finance: do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - House Committee on Finance: do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-25 | Senate | Effective date 6/6/2024. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Chapter 252, 2024 Laws. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2024-03-04 | House | Speaker signed. |
2024-03-04 | Senate | President signed. |
2024-03-01 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2024-03-01 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-29 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2024-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-02-23 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass. |
2024-02-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 9:00 AM. |
2024-02-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2024-02-15 | House | First reading, referred to Finance. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2024-01-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 02 | 055 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
28a | 150 | 412 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 04 | 759 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 12 | 0266 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 32 | 783 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 46 | New Code | See Bill Text |