WA SB6334 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning urban housing supply.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning urban housing supply.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-24SenateSenate Rules "X" file.
2020-02-06SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-02-05SenateHSA - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2020-02-05SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM.
2020-01-27SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM.
2020-01-15SenateFirst reading, referred to Housing Stability & Affordability.

Same As/Similar To

HB2343 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-27 - Effective date 6/11/2020.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback