WA SB6365 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning payments in lieu of real property taxes by the department of fish and wildlife.
Title
Concerning payments in lieu of real property taxes by the department of fish and wildlife.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2559 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-30 - Referred to Appropriations.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=6365&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6365.pdf |