WI AB126 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 38-1)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 38-1)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 941.237 (4), 948.605 (1) (a) and (am) and 948.605 (2) (b) 1. to 5. and 7.; to renumber 167.30, 941.295 (1), 943.13 (1e) (a) and 947.01; to renumber and amend 23.33 (3) (e), 29.089 (2), 29.091, 29.314 (4) (b) 1., 29.621 (4), 440.26 (3m), 941.23, 941.235 (2), 941.295 (2) (d), 941.295 (4), 943.13 (2), 948.605 (2) (b) 6. and 948.605 (2) (b) 8.; to amend 48.685 (2) (bb), 50.065 (2) (bb), 59.54 (6), 66.0409 (3) (b), 165.60, 165.81 (2), 165.82 (1) (intro.), 165.82 (2), 167.31 (1) (b), 813.12 (6) (am) 1., 813.122 (9) (am) 1., 813.125 (5r) (a), 895.527 (5) (a), 938.396 (2g) (n), 939.22 (10), 941.295 (2) (intro.), 943.13 (1m) (b), 943.13 (3), 947.011 (2) (a) 1., 947.011 (2) (c) 1., 947.011 (2) (d), 948.60 (1), 948.605 (2) (b) (intro.), 968.255 (1) (a) 2., 971.37 (1m) (a) 2. and 973.055 (1) (a) 1.; to repeal and recreate 29.314 (3) (b) 1.; and to create 20.455 (2) (gs), 20.455 (2) (gu), 23.33 (3) (e) 1., 23.33 (3) (e) 2., 23.33 (3) (e) 3., 23.33 (3) (e) 4., 29.089 (2) (a), 29.089 (2) (b), 29.089 (2) (c), 29.089 (2) (d), 29.091 (2), 29.314 (4) (b) 1g., 29.621 (4) (a), 29.621 (4) (b), 29.621 (4) (c), 29.621 (4) (d), 29.621 (6), 66.0409 (6), 165.25 (12), 167.30 (2), 167.31 (4) (ar), 167.31 (4) (at), 175.48, 175.49, 175.60, 440.26 (3m) (a), 440.26 (3m) (b), 440.26 (3m) (c), 440.26 (3m) (d), 941.23 (1), 941.23 (2) (b), 941.23 (2) (c), 941.23 (2) (d), 941.23 (2) (e), 941.23 (3), 941.235 (2) (c), 941.235 (2) (d), 941.235 (2) (e), 941.237 (3) (cr), 941.237 (3) (ct), 941.237 (3) (cx), 941.295 (1c) (b) and (c), 941.295 (2) (d) 2., 941.295 (2g), 941.295 (2r), 943.13 (1e) (aL), 943.13 (1e) (bm), 943.13 (1e) (cm), 943.13 (1e) (g), 943.13 (1m) (c), 943.13 (1n), 943.13 (2) (bm), 946.71, 947.01 (2) and 948.605 (2) (b) 1m. and 1r. of the statutes; relating to: carrying a concealed weapon; licenses authorizing persons to carry concealed weapons; possessing or transporting a firearm, bow, or crossbow under certain circumstances; disorderly conduct limitations; photographic identification cards for former law enforcement officers; providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures; requiring the exercise of rule-making authority; making appropriations; and providing penalties. (FE)
Title
Carrying a concealed weapon; licenses authorizing persons to carry concealed weapons; possessing or transporting a firearm, bow, or crossbow under certain circumstances; disorderly conduct limitations; photographic identification cards for former law enforcement officers; providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures; requiring the exercise of rule-making authority; making appropriations; and providing penalties. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2011-07-12 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-06-10 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-06-09 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-05-27 | House | LRB correction |
2011-05-26 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-05-20 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-05-20 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-05-20 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-05-20 | House | LRB correction |
2011-05-17 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-05-13 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-05-12 | House | Public hearing held |
2011-05-10 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Criminal Justice and Corrections |
2011-05-10 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2011/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab126 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2011/REG/AB126.pdf |