WI SB314 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 20-2)
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Published 3-28-2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 20-2)
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Published 3-28-2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 939.617 (2) (b); and to create 948.12 (4) of the statutes; Relating to: possession of child pornography and providing a penalty.
Title
Possession of child pornography and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Senate | Published 3-28-2024 |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 3-27-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 224 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 3-21-2024 |
2024-02-19 | Senate | LRB correction (Senate Substitute Amendment 1) |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2024-02-15 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2024-02-15 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2024-02-15 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-02-15 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-02-15 | House | Read a second time |
2024-02-15 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2024-02-13 | House | Placed on calendar 2-15-2024 by Committee on Rules |
2024-02-12 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2024-02-01 | House | Representative Steffen added as a cosponsor |
2024-01-16 | House | Received from Senate |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Read a second time |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Placed on calendar 1-16-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator James |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator James |
2024-01-03 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2023-12-18 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator James |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Introduced |