DC PR21-0705 | 2015-2016 | 21st Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-17 - Referred to Committee on Business, Consumer, and Regulatory Affairs
Pending: Council Business, Consumer and Regulatory Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-17 - Referred to Committee on Business, Consumer, and Regulatory Affairs
Pending: Council Business, Consumer and Regulatory Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Deemed approved 7/2/2016
Title
Board Of Industrial Trades Council Garth Grannum Confirmation Resolution Of 2016
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-17 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business, Consumer, and Regulatory Affairs |
2016-05-13 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR21-0705 Published in the DC Register |
2016-05-02 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/PR21-0705 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/35770/PR21-0705-Introduction.pdf |