DC PR22-0673 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-27 - Resolution R22-0563 Effective from July 10, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 7797
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-27 - Resolution R22-0563 Effective from July 10, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 7797
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Housing Production Trust Fund Board Charles R. Lowery Confirmation Resolution Of 2017
Title
Housing Production Trust Fund Board Charles R. Lowery Confirmation Resolution Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-07-10 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-27 | Council | Resolution R22-0563 Effective from July 10, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 7797 |
2018-07-10 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0563 |
2018-07-10 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-07-02 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-07-02 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR22-0673 |
2018-06-01 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2017-12-19 | Council | Referred to Committee on Housing and Neighborhood Revitalization |
2017-12-15 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR22-0673 Published in the DC Register |
2017-12-06 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |