FL H0165 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Expands scope of unlawful acts by person infected with sexually transmissible disease; expands list of sexually transmissible diseases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sexually Transmissible Diseases

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-05HouseDied in Judiciary Committee
2017-05-05HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2017-03-30HouseOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 03/30/17, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall --Not Considered
2017-03-20HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2017-03-20HouseFavorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2017-03-16HouseOn Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/20/17, 12:00 pm, Morris Hall
2017-03-07HouseCS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time
2017-03-07HouseIntroduced
2017-02-13HouseNow in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2017-02-09HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2017-02-08HouseCS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2017-02-01HousePCS on Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 02/08/17, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2017-01-05HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S0628 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Health Policy
S1704 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
38423Amended CodeSee Bill Text
38424Amended CodeSee Bill Text
38434Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback