FL H0201 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Creates Urban Core Gun Violence Task Force; provides for membership, staff support, duties & powers, annual reports, & repeal of task force; creates Florida Firearm Violence Reduction Pilot Program; provides eligibility & application requirements; authorizes FDLE to provide grants to specified number of counties to implement pilot program, subject to appropriation; provides requirements for FDLE & participating counties; authorizes FDLE to adopt rules; provides for annual reports; provides for expiration of pilot program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Gun Violence Reduction

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14HouseDied in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2020-03-14HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-02-06HouseNow in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2020-02-05HouseCS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time
2020-02-05HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-02-03HouseCS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2020-01-30HouseOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 02/03/20, 2:00 pm, Sumner Hall
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2019-09-25HouseReferred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2019-09-19HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S652 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
S1802 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Messages
H7101 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
9436872Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9436873Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback