FL S0652 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Creating the Urban Core Gun Violence Task Force; specifying duties and powers of the task force; authorizing the task force to seek assistance from state agencies; providing for access to certain information and records, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urban Core Gun Violence Task Force

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Appropriations
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-02-20SenateNow in Appropriations
2020-02-18SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2020-02-13SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 02/18/20, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
2020-01-31SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
2020-01-29SenateCS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
2020-01-29SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-01-28SenateCS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
2020-01-23SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/28/20, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2019-11-06SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
2019-10-24SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H201 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
S1802 (Related) 2020-03-14 - Died in Messages
H7101 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
9436872Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback