FL H0301 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - Chapter No. 2019-108
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Specifying the required reimbursement of loss adjustment expenses in reimbursement contracts between the State Board of Administration and property insurers under the Florida Hurricane Catastrophe Fund on or after a specified date; revising a criminal penalty for the submission, with certain intent, of an employer application for workers' compensation insurance coverage which contains false, misleading, or incomplete information; providing that certain sworn statements in such applications are not required to be notarized; providing right of contribution of certain liability insurers against other liability insurers for defense costs, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#3 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#83 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18 Chapter No. 2019-108
2019-06-18 Approved by Governor
2019-06-05 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2019-05-03HouseOrdered enrolled
2019-05-03SenateCS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 1
2019-05-03SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-02SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-05-02SenateAmendment(s) failed (243984, 641940)
2019-05-02SenateRead 2nd time
2019-05-02SenateSubstituted for CS/CS/CS/CS/SB 714
2019-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-05-02SenateWithdrawn from Banking and Insurance; Judiciary; Appropriations
2019-04-22SenateReceived
2019-04-18SenateReferred to Banking and Insurance; Judiciary; Appropriations
2019-04-18SenateIn Messages
2019-04-11HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 114 NAYS 0
2019-04-11HouseAmendment(s) adopted (284691)
2019-04-11HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-10HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-10HouseAmendment(s) adopted (514283, 670303, 742057) 614
2019-04-10HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-04HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/10/19
2019-04-03HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-04-02HouseCS/CS/CS by Commerce Committee read 1st time
2019-04-02HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-28HouseCS/CS/CS by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
2019-03-26HouseOn Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 03/28/19, 10:30 am, Webster Hall
2019-03-18HouseNow in Commerce Committee
2019-03-15HouseCS/CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-03-15HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-13HouseCS/CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2019-03-11HouseOn Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 03/13/19, 8:30 am, Sumner Hall
2019-03-05HouseCS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-03-04HouseOn Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 03/06/19, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall -- Temporarily postponed
2019-02-15HouseNow in Civil Justice Subcommittee
2019-02-14HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-02-13HouseCS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 4
2019-02-06HousePCS on Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 02/13/19, 10:30 am, Sumner Hall
2019-01-23HouseReferred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Civil Justice Subcommittee; Commerce Committee
2019-01-16HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S122 (Similar To) 2019-04-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7065 (Ch. 2019-57)
S264 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
H537 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
S714 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 301 (Ch. 2019-108)
H387 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Banking and Insurance, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 301 (Ch. 2019-108)
H765 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 301 (Ch. 2019-108)
S538 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 301 (Ch. 2019-108)
S896 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 301 (Ch. 2019-108)
S1232 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 301 (Ch. 2019-108), CS/HB 1057 (Ch. 2019-92)
S1464 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Banking and Insurance, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 301 (Ch. 2019-108)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
215555Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31930Amended CodeSee Bill Text
440381Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6241055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
624155Amended CodeSee Bill Text
624404Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6244085Amended CodeSee Bill Text
626914Amended CodeSee Bill Text
626916Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6269541Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6270655Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627311Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627351Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627426Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627428Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6274555Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6277015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6277295Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627739Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9210022Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/301
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/301/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/301/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/301/BillText/c2/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/301/BillText/c3/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/301/BillText/e1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/301/BillText/e2/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/301/BillText/er/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/301/Amendment/873379/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/301/Amendment/621725/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/301/Amendment/653069/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/301/Amendment/658153/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/301/Amendment/026789/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/301/Amendment/738311/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/301/Amendment/514283/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/301/Amendment/702911/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/301/Amendment/670303/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/301/Amendment/742057/PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/301/Vote/HouseVote_h00301e1083.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/301/Vote/SenateVote_h00301e2003.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback