FL H0635 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits discrimination on basis of height or weight in specified areas; revises general purpose of Florida Civil Rights Act; revises function of Florida Commission on Human Relations; provides civil & administrative remedies for discrimination on basis of height or weight; provides exception to unlawful employment practices based on height or weight; reenacts provisions relating to administrative & civil remedies for violations of Florida Civil Rights Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Unlawful Discrimination

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14HouseDied in Civil Justice Subcommittee
2020-03-14HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2019-11-25HouseReferred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2019-11-14HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S644 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
H863 (Related) 2020-03-14 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
S1168 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
420516Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509092Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76005Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76007Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76008Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76010Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76011Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback