FL H0991 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits state authority from suspending or revoking person's professional license, certificate, registration, or permit solely on basis of delinquency or default in payment of his or her student loan; prohibits state authority from suspending or revoking person's professional license, certificate, registration, or permit solely on basis of default in satisfying requirements of his or her work-conditional scholarship; repeals provisions to conform provisions to changes made by act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Keep Our Graduates Working Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseDied in Appropriations Committee
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-26HouseNow in Appropriations Committee
2019-03-26HouseFavorable by Business and Professions Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 1
2019-03-22HouseOn Committee agenda-- Business and Professions Subcommittee, 03/26/19, 12:00 pm, Webster Hall
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-02-28HouseReferred to Business and Professions Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Health and Human Services Committee
2019-02-20HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1090 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
S948 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100995Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1009951Amended CodeSee Bill Text
456072Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4560721Amended CodeSee Bill Text
456074Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback