FL H1393 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Chapter No. 2020-162
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides exemptions from public records requirements for certain information made available to OFR in Financial Technology Sandbox applications by specified providers of innovative financial products or services, & for certain information relating on such providers; provides for future legislative review & repeal of exemptions; provides statement of public necessity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pub. Rec./Financial Technology Sandbox

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#11 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#578 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-01 Chapter No. 2020-162
2020-06-30 Approved by Governor
2020-06-17 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2020-03-10HouseOrdered enrolled
2020-03-10SenateCS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
2020-03-10SenateRead 3rd time
2020-03-09SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-09SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-09SenateReceived
2020-03-09SenateSubstituted for CS/CS/SB 1872
2020-03-09SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-03-09SenateWithdrawn from Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Banking and Insurance; Rules
2020-03-09SenateReferred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Banking and Insurance; Rules
2020-03-09SenateIn Messages
2020-03-09HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 117 NAYS 0
2020-03-09HouseRead 3rd time
2020-03-06HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-06HouseAmendment(s) adopted (525031) 839
2020-03-06HouseRead 2nd time
2020-03-03HouseCS/CS by State Affairs Committee read 1st time
2020-03-03HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20
2020-03-03HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-03-03HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-03-02HouseCS/CS by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 23 NAYS 0
2020-03-01HouseOn Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 03/02/20, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
2020-02-06HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2020-02-06HouseCS referred to State Affairs Committee
2020-02-06HouseOriginal reference(s) removed: Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee
2020-02-05HouseCS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee read 1st time
2020-02-05HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-02-04HouseCS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2020-01-31HouseOn Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 02/04/20, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall
2020-01-17HouseReferred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2020-01-13HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1391 (Related) 2020-07-01 - Chapter No. 2020-161
S1872 (Same As) 2020-03-09 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1393
S1870 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/HB 1391
H1395 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in State Affairs Committee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
559952Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback