FL H1425 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes certain local governments to set aside specified percentage of funds for procuring personal property & services to enter into contracts with microbusinesses; requires such contracts to be competitively solicited only among microbusinesses; provides eligibility for microbusinesses under Microfinance Loan Program; revises date by which DEO must contract with certain entities to administer loan program; provides eligibility for microbusinesses under Microfinance Guarantee Program; provides eligibility for microbusinesses under DOT's highway project business development program; provides eligibility for microbusinesses under WMD programs.
Title
Assistance for Microbusinesses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-17 | House | Referred to Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee; Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; Commerce Committee |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S216 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
287 | 085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 9931 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 9932 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 9934 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 9935 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 9936 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
337 | 027 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 1135 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1425 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1425/BillText/Filed/PDF |