FL H1431 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides requirements for blasting limits in areas with low depth to water table; requires that blasting reports be submitted to Chief Financial Officer & State Fire Marshal; requires division to make such reports publicly available on its webpage; provides report requirements; provides for civil actions to recover certain damages.
Title
Construction Materials Mining Activities
Sponsors
Rep. Cindy Polo [D] | Rep. Amy Mercado [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-17 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1047 (Similar To) 2020-09-21 - Chapter No. 2020-180
S1560 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Environment and Natural Resources
S1618 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1047
S1560 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Environment and Natural Resources
S1618 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1047
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
552 | 30 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
552 | 36 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1431 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1431/BillText/Filed/PDF |