FL H6021 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Deletes provisions that require certain local government measures to expire within specified time period unless extended or renewed.
Title
Rent Control Measures
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-01-22 | House | Referred to Local Administration and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Commerce Committee; State Affairs Committee |
2021-01-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1020 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Community Affairs
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
125 | 0103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
166 | 043 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/6021 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/6021/BillText/Filed/PDF |