FL S0062 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring that a resolution to levy discretionary sales tax include a statement containing certain information; defining the term "early college program"; changing the calculation of full-time equivalent student membership for dual enrollment purposes; providing for calculation of full-time equivalent membership for students earning the Capstone Diploma; requiring school board mental health policies and procedures to include certain items, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

K-12 Education

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Appropriations
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-02-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/03/20, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed
2020-02-03SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/06/20, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Meeting cancelled
2020-01-31SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/05/20, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed
2020-01-31SenateNow in Appropriations
2020-01-29SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2020-01-24SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, 01/29/20, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2020-01-23SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, 01/28/20, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered
2020-01-14SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2020-01-13SenateFavorable by Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2020-01-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Education, 01/13/20, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-12-20SenateReferred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
2019-12-19SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H641 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Chapter No. 2020-94
S836 (Similar To) 2020-03-11 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 641
S1246 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
S7040 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 7065
H187 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
H7097 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Chapter No. 2020-10
H7067 (Similar To) 2020-06-26 - Chapter No. 2020-95
H7103 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Education

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10034282Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1007273Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101162Amended CodeSee Bill Text
212055Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback