FL S0850 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Deleting provisions under which a state attorney either must request a court to transfer and certify children of certain ages who commit specified crimes for prosecution as adults or must provide written reasons to the court for not making such a request, or proceed under certain provisions; revising the circumstances under which a state attorney may file an information in cases that involve children of certain ages who commit certain crimes, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prosecuting Children as Adults

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Criminal Justice
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-19SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Appropriations
2019-02-07SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H339 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
S1260 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
H6051 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar
H575 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
S876 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
H7125 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
S642 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 7125

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
98503Amended CodeSee Bill Text
98515Amended CodeSee Bill Text
98526Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985265Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985556Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985557Amended CodeSee Bill Text
98556Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985565Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback