FL H0575 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Removes references to state attorney's discretion to direct file juvenile; revises discretionary direct file criteria; removes provisions for mandatory direct file; provides for opportunity for hearing to reverse direct file; revises provisions concerning housing of children held in detention.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Direct Filing of an Information

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseDied in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-29HouseNow in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2019-03-28HouseCS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-03-28HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-26HouseCS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2019-03-22HouseOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 03/26/19, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-02-06HouseReferred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2019-01-28HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H6051 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar
H1293 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
S876 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
H339 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
S850 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice
S870 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice
S1260 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
H7125 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
S642 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 7125

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
985265Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985557Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback