FL S1836 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the Agency for Health Care Administration to publish by a specified date an annual report identifying certain health care services; revising the definition of the term "shoppable health care service"; revising duties of certain health insurers and health maintenance organizations, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Insurance Benefits

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-02-19SenateCS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time
2020-02-19SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
2020-02-18SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-02-17SenateCS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 3 NAYS 1
2020-02-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/17/20, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
2020-01-22SenateIntroduced
2020-01-17SenateReferred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations
2020-01-13SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1279 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
H731 (Similar To) 2020-07-01 - Chapter No. 2020-156
S1726 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 731

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
40805Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6276387Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6276648Amended CodeSee Bill Text
64131076Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback