MA H912 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-31 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-31 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to secured lending by the Federal Home Loan Bank. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to certain loans by the Federal Home Loan Bank
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-31 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2016-05-26 | House | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2016-03-24 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-03-24 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-03-24 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2016-03-09 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2015-06-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/30/2015 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H3810 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
S175 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Reprinted as amended, see S2194
H84 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4623
H1060 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S239 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2215
S401 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H95 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4614
S391 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H3343 (Similar To) 2016-01-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 4 of the Acts of 2016
S175 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Reprinted as amended, see S2194
H84 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4623
H1060 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S239 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2215
S401 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H95 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4614
S391 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H3343 (Similar To) 2016-01-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 4 of the Acts of 2016
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H912 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H912.pdf |