MS SC558 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-9)
Status: Passed on February 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-22 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-9)
Status: Passed on February 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-22 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Saluting Former University Of Mississippi Rebel Quarterback Elisha (eli) Manning For Winning The Super Bowl Xlvi Championship And Earning Most Valuable Player Honors.
Title
Commend former University of Mississippi Rebel Quarterback Eli Manning for winning Super Bowl XLVI and MVP honors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-21 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-22 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-02-22 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-02-21 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2012-02-21 | Immediate Release | |
2012-02-21 | Adopted | |
2012-02-16 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2012-02-15 | Referred To Rules | |
2012-02-15 | Transmitted To House | |
2012-02-15 | Immediate Release | |
2012-02-15 | Adopted | |
2012-02-14 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2012-02-13 | Referred To Rules |