NC H32 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-05 - Re-ref Com On Judiciary I
Pending: Senate Judiciary I Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-05 - Re-ref Com On Judiciary I
Pending: Senate Judiciary I Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Habitual DWI
Title
Amend Habitual DWI
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-09 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-05 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Judiciary I |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2015-03-10 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-03-09 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-03-09 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-03-05 | House | Placed On Cal For 03/09/2015 |
2015-03-04 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-03-04 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-02-02 | House | Ref To Com On Judiciary II |
2015-02-02 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-01-29 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S309 (Same As) 2015-03-24 - Re-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Judiciary I